Publication: FTA-1003
Revision: 6
Title: FTSC Membership List
Author: Administrator
Revision Date: 02 January 2000
Expiry Date: 02 January 2002
----------------------------------------------------------------------
Contents:
1. FTSC Administrator
2. FTSC Standing Members
3. Standing Working Groups
4. Special Assignment Working Groups
----------------------------------------------------------------------
1. FTSC Administrator
---------------------
Colin Turner, 2:443/13, appointed until 31 Dec 2002.
2. FTSC Standing Members
------------------------
Name Node What Appointed until
--------------------------------------------------------------
Lothar Behet 2:2446/301 01 Oct 2000
Mike Bilow 1:323/107 FP-OS/2 01 Oct 2000
Tobias Burchhardt 2:2448/400 FastEcho 01 Oct 2000
Todd Cochrane 1:345/2 01 Oct 2000
Charles Cruden 1:342/806 Internet Rex 01 Oct 2001
Goran Eriksson 2:201/505 01 Oct 2001
Tobias Ernst 2:2476/418 01 Oct 2001
Bjorn Felten 2:203/208 01 Oct 2001
David Hallford 1:208/103 01 Oct 2000
Harald Harms 2:282/505 Allfix 01 Oct 2001
Joaquim Homrighausen 2:201/330 Frodo 01 Oct 2000
Andreas Klein 2:2480/47 Imail 01 Oct 2000
Gino Lucrezi 2:335/610 01 Oct 2001
Michael McCabe 1:297/11 FNS 01 Oct 2001
Brent Shellenberg 1:229/606 Shotgun 01 Oct 2001
Colin Turner 2:443/13 01 Oct 2001
Thomas Waldmann 2:2474/400 BT-XE 01 Oct 2000
Mats Wallin 2:201/329 FDAPX 01 Oct 2000
3. Standing Working Groups
--------------------------
Working Group A - Data Transmitted
----------------------------------
Leader: Mats Wallin
Tobias Burchhardt
Charles Cruden
Goran Eriksson
Joaquim Homrighausen
Andreas Klein
Colin Turner
Thomas Waldmann
Mats Wallin
Working Group B - Connection and Protocols
------------------------------------------
Leader: Thomas Waldmann
Lothar Behet
Tobias Burchhardt
Todd Cochrane
Charles Cruden
Joaquim Homrighausen
Thomas Waldmann
Working Group C - Echomail and Routing
--------------------------------------
Leader: Andreas Klein
Lothar Behet
Tobias Burchhardt
Charles Cruden
Goran Eriksson
Tobias Ernst
Harald Harms
Andreas Klein
Joaquim Homrighausen
Michael McCabe
Mats Wallin
Working Group D - Nodelist
--------------------------
Leader: Michael McCabe
Lothar Behet
Todd Cochrane
Tobias Ernst
David Halford
Joaquim Homrighausen
Gino Lucrezi
Michael McCabe
Colin Turner
Thomas Waldmann
Working Group E - Gateways
--------------------------
Leader: Lothar Behet
Lothar Behet
Todd Cochrane
Charles Cruden
Tobias Ernst
Harald Harms
Gino Lucrezi
Colin Turner
4. Special Assignment Working Groups
------------------------------------
To be formed as determined by the FTSC Standing Members and
Administrator
Working Group Y - Year 2000
---------------------------
Leader: Colin Turner
Todd Cochrane
Colin Turner
A. History
----------
Rev.1, 19971005: First non-draft release.
Rev.2, 19971204: Reformatted document slightly. Working group Y2K
added. Working group members added.
Rev.3, 19971229: Year 2000 working group renamed from Y2K to Y.
Leaders added for groups C and Y.
Rev.4, 19980117: Group E added. Leaders added for groups A, B, D and
E. Updated member list for group C.
Rev.5, 19990109: Lists updated to reflect election results and
resignations.
Rev.6, 20000102: Lists updated for resignations.