Publication: FTA-1003
Revision: 5
Title: FTSC Membership List
Author: Administrator
Revision Date: 18 January 1999
Expiry Date: 18 January 2001
----------------------------------------------------------------------
Contents:
1. FTSC Administrator
2. FTSC Standing Members
3. Standing Working Groups
4. Special Assignment Working Groups
----------------------------------------------------------------------
1. FTSC Administrator
---------------------
Colin Turner, 2:443/13, appointed until 31 Dec 2002.
2. FTSC Standing Members
------------------------
Name Node What Appointed until
--------------------------------------------------------------
Lothar Behet 2:2446/301 01 Oct 2000
Ron Bemis 1:124/1113 01 Oct 1999
Mike Bilow 1:323/107 FP-OS/2 01 Oct 2000
Tobias Burchhardt 2:2448/400 FastEcho 01 Oct 2000
Todd Cochrane 1:345/2 01 Oct 2000
Goran Eriksson 2:201/505 01 Oct 1999
Bjorn Felten 2:203/208 01 Oct 1999
Zorch Frezberg 1:205/1701 01 Oct 1999
David Hallford 1:208/103 01 Oct 2000
Joaquim Homrighausen 2:201/330 Frodo 01 Oct 2000
Peter Karlsson 2:206/221 Announcer 01 Oct 1999
Andreas Klein 2:2480/47 Imail 01 Oct 2000
Michael McCabe 1:297/11 FNS 01 Oct 1999
Gary Price 1:3607/26 TriBBS 01 Oct 1999
Sean Rima 2:252/300 01 Oct 2000
Carlos Fernandez Sanz 2:341/70 CFRoute 01 Oct 2000
Benjamin Schollnick 1:2613/477 QuickBBS 01 Oct 2000
Odinn Sorensen 2:236/77 GoldED 01 Oct 2000
Jason Steck 1:285/424 Jmail 01 Oct 1999
Colin Turner 2:443/13 01 Oct 1999
Thomas Waldmann 2:2474/400 BT-XE 01 Oct 2000
Mats Wallin 2:201/329 FDAPX 01 Oct 2000
3. Standing Working Groups
--------------------------
Working Group A - Data Transmitted
----------------------------------
Leader: Mats Wallin
Tobias Burchhardt
Goran Eriksson
Joaquim Homrighausen
Andreas Klein
Benjamin Schollnick
Odinn Sorensen
Colin Turner
Thomas Waldmann
Mats Wallin
Working Group B - Connection and Protocols
------------------------------------------
Leader: Thomas Waldmann
Lothar Behet
Tobias Burchhardt
Todd Cochrane
Carlos Fernandez Sanz
Zorch Frezberg
Joaquim Homrighausen
Sean Rima
Thomas Waldmann
Working Group C - Echomail and Routing
--------------------------------------
Leader: Andreas Klein
Lothar Behet
Ron Bemis
Tobias Burchhardt
Goran Eriksson
Peter Karlsson
Andreas Klein
Joaquim Homrighausen
Michael McCabe
Sean Rima
Benjamin Schollnick
Odinn Sorensen
Francois Thunus
Mats Wallin
Working Group D - Nodelist
--------------------------
Leader: Michael McCabe
Lothar Behet
Todd Cochrane
David Halford
Joaquim Homrighausen
Michael McCabe
Colin Turner
Richard Bash
Zorch Frezberg
Thomas Waldmann
tom schlangen
Working Group E - Gateways
--------------------------
Leader: <To Be Appointed>
Lothar Behet
Sean Rima
Todd Cochrane
Odinn Sorensen
4. Special Assignment Working Groups
------------------------------------
To be formed as determined by the FTSC Standing Members and
Administrator
Working Group Y - Year 2000
---------------------------
Leader: Colin Turner
Todd Cochrane
Colin Turner
Benjamin Schollnick
Odinn Sorensen
A. History
----------
Rev.1, 19971005: First non-draft release.
Rev.2, 19971204: Reformatted document slightly. Working group Y2K
added. Working group members added.
Rev.3, 19971229: Year 2000 working group renamed from Y2K to Y.
Leaders added for groups C and Y.
Rev.4, 19980117: Group E added. Leaders added for groups A, B, D and
E. Updated member list for group C.
Rec.5, 19990109: Lists updated to reflect election results and
resignations.